CHARITY OF EDWARD MARKE

Charity number: 239476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £786 £840 £855 £1.16k £920
Total expenditure £598 £428 £600 £1.19k £462
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A