The Wellbeing Project Brecon

Charity number: 239606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.06k £14.87k £15.76k £24.97k £32.98k
Total expenditure £873 £13.77k £13.45k £24.24k £26.23k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A £5.00k £5.00k