Accounts and annual returns POTTERS BAR AND DISTRICT SOCIETY FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN & ADULTS

Charity number: 239967
Charity reporting is overdue by 1794 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 333 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 333 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 698 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 698 days
Annual return 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1064 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1064 days
Annual return 30 September 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1429 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1429 days
Annual return 30 September 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1794 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1794 days