CONGREGATION OF SERVANTS OF MARY (LONDON)

Charity number: 241434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.26m £1.78m £1.20m £1.22m £1.21m
Total expenditure £1.35m £1.30m £1.26m £1.25m £1.05m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £475.86k £657.96k £447.15k £400.69k £485.48k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £758.00k £730.44k £744.97k £783.90k £720.23k
Income - Other £30.36k £319.73k £5.58k £36.34k £8.16k
Income - Legacies £3.00k £34.60k £43.40k £1.02k £9.77k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.30m £1.24m £1.21m £1.20m £995.91k
Expenditure - Raising funds £56.20k £60.04k £53.53k £50.50k £50.21k
Expenditure - Governance £26.93k £28.03k £27.61k £27.40k £29.89k
Expenditure - Grants institution £26.00k £38.48k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £56.20k £60.04k £53.53k £50.50k £50.21k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0