Financial history THE JOHN S COHEN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 241598
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £564.40k £619.13k £628.83k £630.15k £641.59k
Total expenditure £563.25k £617.73k £597.36k £534.59k £700.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £564.40k £619.13k £628.83k £630.15k £641.59k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £520.37k £567.81k £499.99k £458.26k £640.88k
Expenditure - Raising funds £42.88k £49.93k £97.37k £76.33k £59.37k
Expenditure - Governance £10.53k £10.67k £10.82k £11.01k £5.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £458.90k £505.32k £435.35k £393.22k £565.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £97.37k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0