ST MICHAEL, SOUTH ELMHAM PARISH LAND TRUST

Charity number: 242255
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 May 2017 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required