PILGRIM HOMES (FORMERLY AGED PILGRIMS' FRIEND SOCIETY)

Charity number: 242266
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £12.19m £2.55m £1.05m £1.92m £1.57m
Total expenditure £10.91m £2.08m £971.00k £529.00k £20.13m
Income from government contracts £2.31m £438.84k £110.26k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £222.89k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.26m £390.00k £523.00k £1.84m £1.49m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £10.84m £2.12m £464.00k £9.00k £8.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £94.00k £40.00k £59.00k £63.00k £70.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £944.00k £208.00k £127.00k £323.00k £980.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £10.89m £2.07m £971.00k £516.00k £522.00k
Expenditure - Raising funds £21.00k £6.00k £0 £13.00k £13.00k
Expenditure - Governance £14.00k £12.00k £0 £4.00k £9.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £19.60m