DOVER SOCIETY FOR THE MENTALLY HANDICAPPED

Charity number: 242395
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £3.26k £3.43k £1.06k £1.64k £760
Total expenditure £1.38k £2.37k £174 £882 £669
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A