THE VICTORY TRUST

Charity number: 242526
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
COLIN FREWIN Trustee 11 December 2012 None on record
Graham Bailey Trustee 05 November 2019 None on record
Anthony Michael Kelly Trustee 01 November 2013 None on record
MICHAEL HODGSON Trustee 10 December 2012 None on record
Tim harman Chair 15 November 2015 None on record