Trustees CT 10 PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Charity number: 242942

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNIFER MARGARET MATTERFACE | Chair | 05 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev Matt Hodder | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Gregory | Trustee | 04 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Ian Geiffrey Dunn | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Bailey | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kate Louise Grant | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Dawn Lambert | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Michael John Garner | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger Keith Binks | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Mary Mills | Trustee | 12 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Barry Dominic Fenton | Trustee | 06 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Liz Baker | Trustee | 12 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev Philip Musindi | Trustee | 21 September 2011 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.