Financial history FLORE WIDOWS (CARTWRIGHT AND CURTIS) CHARITY

Charity number: 243242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.86k £1.50k £1.71k £1.74k £1.76k
Total expenditure £930 £1.93k £2.25k £1.92k £520
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A