CHARITY OF THOMAS THOMLINSON

Charity number: 243821
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 November 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required