THE SALISBURY ST THOMAS AND ST EDMUND CHARITY

Charity number: 243863
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.55k £3.67k £3.80k £3.88k £3.96k
Total expenditure £1.77k £4.99k £6.24k £2.32k £3.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A