Trustees HOYLAKE CHAMBER CONCERT SOCIETY
Charity number: 243866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HA-IL KIM | Chair | 05 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Diane Rushworth | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Christine Williams | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elaine Christina Sanderson | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR PAUL TIMOTHY BAINES | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
David John Stevenson | Trustee | 19 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
KATHARINE JANE CLARE HOOPER | Trustee | 02 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
LAWRENCE EDWARD GARTSIDE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.