PARSONAGE RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 243905
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £35.86k £36.25k £38.05k £34.81k £29.08k
Total expenditure £33.20k £35.09k £34.81k £37.21k £29.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £300 £0 £0 N/A N/A