PAROCHIAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 244095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 April 2019 170 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 06 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required