BISHOP BEVERIDGE CLUB

Charity number: 244408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £21.38k £25.83k £23.34k £25.54k £22.27k
Total expenditure £20.34k £22.66k £22.80k £21.72k £20.41k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £500 £10.00k