BRITISH DIVISION OF THE INTERNATIONAL ACADEMY OF PATHOLOGY

Charity number: 244450
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £566.16k £557.28k £616.00k £606.19k £613.42k
Total expenditure £450.29k £533.08k £403.59k £523.28k £516.67k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £81.55k £25.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £493.35k £488.03k £542.12k £450.44k £513.35k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £72.82k £69.26k £73.88k £74.21k £75.08k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £91.02k £103.93k £115.58k £523.28k £494.72k
Expenditure - Raising funds £359.27k £429.15k £288.01k £0 £21.95k
Expenditure - Governance £91.02k £103.93k £115.58k £136.55k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £21.95k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0