Financial history CHARITY KNOWN AS ST MARTIN'S CHURCH HALL

Charity number: 244492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.41k £1.62k £1.31k £708 £1.01k
Total expenditure £677 £1.88k £714 £1.16k £668
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A