Trustees ROYAL PHILHARMONIC ORCHESTRA LIMITED
Charity number: 244533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Mark James WATTS | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Nathanael CIRTINA | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Her Excellency KAREN-MAE CORALIE HILL OBE | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Jeffrey STOREY | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
LORD PAUL YAW BOATENG | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Elisabeth Anne Varlow | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK JOHN FLANAGHAN | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Henry KELLER | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|||||
SALI-WYN RYAN | Trustee | 30 October 2018 |
|
|||||
ELIZABETH CASE | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
JAMES WYNDHAM WILLIAMS | Trustee | 29 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.