ASHILL WELFARE CHARITY

Charity number: 245264
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £6.77k £8.69k £10.12k £11.03k £18.55k
Total expenditure £10.71k £8.82k £13.27k £8.50k £5.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £3.18k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.00k