Trustees THE WORTWELL TOWN LANDS CHARITY
Charity number: 245608
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER DAVID THOMAS | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Margaret Collyer | Trustee | 10 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA READ | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAPHNE COOK | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALLISON COPENAN | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE JOHNSON | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|||||
SARAH NOY | Trustee | 05 May 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.