Trustees BRADFORD ON AVON PRESERVATION TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 245611
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Potter | Chair | 05 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gilllian Isobel Livingstone | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Marian Heselton | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel George Wiltshire | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Frances Regina Nevin | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew William Eberlin | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paige Balas | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kate Nicholls | Trustee | 12 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kate Larard | Trustee | 10 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Macgregor | Trustee | 09 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.