THE ROTARY CLUB OF WARRINGTON CHARITY FUND

Charity number: 245713
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 06 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 06 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 05 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 05 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 11 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 11 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 24 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 24 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 29 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 29 November 2016 On time Download