Linked charities CAMBRIDGE FUND FOR OLD AND DISABLED SOLDIERS
Charity number: 245807
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 26 MAY 1905 30 AUGUST 1938 12 SEPTEMBER 1972 AND 23 MAY 1984
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF WOUNDED,DISABLES AND DECAYED SOLDIERS OF THE ARMY OF HIS MAJESTY THE KING AND HISS SUCCESSORS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 03 January 1966 : Standard registration
- 22 December 2020 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.