MYNYDDYGARREG WELFARE HALL

Charity number: 245873
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £31.57k £30.09k £32.66k £37.68k £33.39k
Total expenditure £29.51k £25.80k £33.80k £30.35k £30.61k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A