Financial history MID-SUSSEX MENCAP

Charity number: 246001
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £21.29k £9.99k £11.85k £10.40k £872
Total expenditure £46.37k £22.41k £33.66k £35.14k £8.50k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A