STISTED VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 246278
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £13.82k £14.20k £13.43k £15.23k £14.75k
Total expenditure £11.30k £13.40k £12.76k £13.11k £12.25k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £600 £0 £0 £500 N/A