Accounts and annual returns THE CITY OF LONDON BATTALION THE ROYAL FUSILIERS (CITY OF LONDON REGIMENT) CHARITY FUND

Charity number: 246634
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2022 21 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 05 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 09 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 25 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required