Governing document AGE CONCERN HERTFORDSHIRE
Charity number: 246822
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH NOVEMBER 1965 AS AMENDED 14TH OCTOBER 1976,13TH OCTOBER 1977,23RD JUNE 1981,22ND JUNE 1982, 28TH JUNE 1984 AND 26TH OCTOBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE ELDERLY IN THE COUNTY OF HERTFORDSHIRE IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
HERTFORDSHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.