Accounts and annual returns ALLOTMENT FOR THE LABOURING POOR

Charity number: 247385
Charity reporting is overdue by 166 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 166 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 166 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 October 2022 266 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2022 365 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required