Trustees WORCESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED
Charity number: 247778
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wadham St John Downing | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
The Revd Canon Dr Stephen Michael Edwards | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Michael Douglas Hunter | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Tafadzwa Harriet Terera | Trustee | 13 January 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Robert John Pearce | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
David Michael Wightman | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
The Revd Dr Richard Johnson | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
The Revd Canon Timothy John Williams | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
PHILIP VICTOR KEAR | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
The Rt Revd Martin Charles William Gorick | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev Allison Claire Davies | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
Dewi Ieuan Ap Rhys Phillips | Trustee | 03 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Claire Ann Lording | Trustee | 19 December 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
Canon Hugh Alan Richards | Trustee | 19 December 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
ERIC ALLEN WILES | Trustee | 16 March 2017 |
|
|||||||||||
THE VEN NICOLA JANE GROARKE | Trustee | 11 January 2014 |
|
|||||||||||
THE RT REVD JOHN GEOFFREY INGE | Trustee | 20 November 2007 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.