Trustees THE COVENTRY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LTD
Charity number: 247828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
27 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN JOHN COOMBER | Chair | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||
The Right Reverend Ruth Elizabeth Worsley | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|||||
The Right Reverend Malayil Lukose Varghese Muthalaly | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev April Clare Gold | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Esther Louise Peers | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Anita Nora Carmel Morgan | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Timothy David Cockell | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew George Batchelor | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Richard John Elton | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev David Elis Poultney | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP ALEXANDER SEWARDS | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Ogechi Ugochi Ngemegwai | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH WILLIAMS | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Sarah Natasha Iona Mount | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marion Elizabeth MacLellan | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emili JoLynn LOWERY | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev BARRY JAMES JACKSON | Trustee | 26 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev JONATHAN NOEL JEE | Trustee | 26 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev Stephen Parker | Trustee | 26 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev Kay Dyer | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev Alison Jane Evans | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|||||
The Venerable Barry John Dugmore | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Claire Louise McArthur | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mary Joanna King | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Hugh Pollard | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
THE VERY REVD JOHN JULIAN WITCOMBE | Trustee | 15 February 2013 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER HENRY BAKER | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.