Trustees THE SOCIETY FOR ARMY HISTORICAL RESEARCH
Charity number: 247844

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Major-General Ashley Truluck CB CBE MA | Trustee | 19 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rohan Saravanamuttu BSc MA ACA | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rory Butcher BA MA | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Phillips PhD, FHEA | Trustee | 24 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER PALMER BSc ARSM | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE F O DIVALL MA FINS | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
EAMONN O'KEEFFE MPhil | Trustee | 06 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANDREW BAMFORD MA | Trustee | 30 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANDREW CORMACK BA FSA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.