Governing document WHITWELL COMMON CHARITY
Charity number: 248177
Charity reporting is overdue by 21 days
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 14/03/1905 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 02/08/1935 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 30/01/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 30/03/2012 as amended on 19 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
GRAZING FOR LIVESTOCK OF QUALIFIED COMMONERS WHICH IS LIMITED TO TWO BEASTS SPLIT HOOF AND ONE BEAST ROUND HOOF AND NOT MORE PER PERSON.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
THE ANCIENT PARISH OF WHITWELL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.