Trustees THE TRURO DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED
Charity number: 248330
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL JAMES STURGESS | Chair | 26 September 2015 |
|
|||||||
Rev Simon Joseph Robinson | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|||||||
Roger Bayley Smith | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Paul Robert Holley | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Robert Jeffrey Terry | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Andrew Peter Hicks | Trustee | 06 November 2021 |
|
|||||||
The Venerable Kelly Anne Betteridge | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|||||||
Rev Teresa Lorraine Folland | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|||||||
Rev Hugh Nelson | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|||||||
Anna Elizabeth Harborne Corbett | Trustee | 07 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Christopher Charles McQuillen-Wright | Trustee | 29 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||
DR Andrew Gibb Thompson | Trustee | 20 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Charlotte Elisabeth Irwin | Trustee | 16 October 2015 |
|
|
||||||
ROBERT JOHN PERRY | Trustee | 21 May 2013 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.