Trustees THE NATIONAL CHRYSANTHEMUM SOCIETY
Charity number: 248484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Nevill | Trustee | 26 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Allen | Trustee | 27 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colin Parkes | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ngaire Hall | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Parkes | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alan Smith | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Derek John Pierce | Trustee | 15 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROY WHIFFEN | Trustee | 21 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Trevor William Lawrence | Trustee | 21 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Richard Mark Watson | Trustee | 21 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
John Bawden | Trustee | 15 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Daphne Hogg | Trustee | 15 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Vincent Aldred | Trustee | 15 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
DR DOROTHY SPENCER PHD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr GRAHAM ALLERTON BARCLAY PHD CBIOL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN LETTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR KEN DEAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR BARR HOGG | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR MIKE HIGGINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER BROWNBRIDGE | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR TERRY PORTER | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.