Trustees THE ROYAL MILITARY POLICE CENTRAL BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity number: 248713
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brigadier Sarah Louise Pringle-Smith | Chair | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lieutenant-Colonel Kate Alia Garwood | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Arthur Potts | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Warrant Officer Class One Jon Miller | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Colonel Kristian Paul Rotchell | Trustee | 21 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Corporal Taliesha Stuart | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Bratton | Trustee | 08 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Commodore Steve Moorhouse OBE | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Brigadier Maurice Nugent CBE | Trustee | 12 March 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.