Financial history HENBURY CHURCH LANDS CHARITY

Charity number: 248810
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.09k £2.20k £2.30k £6.01k £2.02k
Total expenditure £1.58k £1.70k £2.19k £2.70k £1.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A