Financial history ALLOTMENT FOR THE LABOURING POOR

Charity number: 249056
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £70 £70 £70 £70 £70
Total expenditure £70 £70 £70 £282 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A