POORS LAND AND RATCLIFFE CHARITY

Charity number: 249155
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £845 £3.29k £20.19k £961 £974
Total expenditure £525 £635 £1.18k £2.30k £1.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A