Financial history 145 (SOUTH) BRIGADE CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 249274
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £62.11k £83.01k £84.75k £84.75k £269.45k
Total expenditure £65.52k £71.61k £95.41k £95.41k £297.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A