Trustees FIRST AID NURSING YEOMANRY (PRINCESS ROYAL'S VOLUNTEER CORPS) (FANY(PRVC))
Charity number: 249360
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lady KATHARINE BRAZIER | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Dyson QPM | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Frances Blois | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Bogue | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Air Vice-Marshal Ranald Torquil Ian Munro CBE TDVRDL | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|||||
WILLIAM BENEDICT DE CUSANCE CUSSANS | Trustee | 24 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Brigadier John Padget Weller | Trustee | 24 February 2016 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.