Trustees THE BATH AND WELLS DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Charity number: 249398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
26 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Rt Revd Dr Noel Michael Roy Beasley | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Nicholas David Tall | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Robert Dean | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Rev DAVID MARK KEEN | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Sarah Grace Bult | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Dr Edmund Ian Marshall | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Rev Morey Alisdair Christopher Andrews | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Rev Richard James Miles | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Revd Preb Julian Bernard Vere Laurence | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Rev Ann Elizabeth Fulton | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Tracey Jane Khodabandehloo | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Duncan Ian Theodoreson | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Dr Robert Michael Sage | Trustee | 04 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Philip Charles Edge | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Dr Caroline Frances Mason | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Dr AXEL ANTHONY PALMER | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Marilyn Lee | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
James Loring | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Rev ROGER DRIVER | Trustee | 29 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
The Ven Anne Gell | Trustee | 28 May 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Rev Jane Haslam | Trustee | 11 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
The Ven Simon Hill | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
The Ven Adrian Youings | Trustee | 11 January 2016 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Stephen Grimshaw | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Rev Ruth Worsley | Trustee | 29 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Timothy Hind | Trustee | 01 April 2008 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.