Trustees THE LLANDUDNO JUNCTION VILLAGE WAR MEMORIAL
Charity number: 249903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Evans | Chair | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Jones | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Ann Owens | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Williams | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Paul Jones | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Shotter | Trustee | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Stewart | Trustee | 12 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Phillips | Trustee | 01 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Meirion Hughes | Trustee | 28 March 1996 |
|
|
||||
Sophia Morris | Trustee | 28 March 1996 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.