Trustees THE MOTHERS' UNION (DIOCESE OF GUILDFORD) BRANCH
Charity number: 249931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTONIA SUSAN MARY WILSON | Chair | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dawn May | Trustee | 04 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Bingham | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Summerfield | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Diana Wood | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dorothea Nattrass | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Edwin Catt | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Shirley Martin | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA TAYLOR | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA SUTHERLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.