Financial history THE MOTHERS' UNION DIOCESE OF LICHFIELD

Charity number: 249942
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £100.41k £98.11k £86.13k £84.60k £55.84k
Total expenditure £98.74k £94.18k £80.16k £98.86k £64.59k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A