CONGREGATION OF ST MARY OF THE ANGELS

Charity number: 250185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £279.84k £275.40k £206.03k £308.30k £277.90k
Total expenditure £199.17k £178.90k £218.83k £234.62k £185.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A