Trustees THE MOTHERS' UNION (DIOCESE OF ST ASAPH BRANCH)
Charity number: 250430
Charity reporting is overdue by 179 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BERYL GRIFFITH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kathleen Benison | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jennifer Churm | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
KAREN ELIZABETH STRINGER NON VOTING | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
NORMA EMMA WARING MOLLARD | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
VENERABLE JOHN BERRY THELWELL NON VOTING | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANET MARY REES | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOAN BARKER | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN REES NON VOTING | Trustee | 08 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
OLIVE ELIZABETH SHERIFF | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET HARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev MARY BROTHERSTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.