Trustees YMCA Scarborough

Charity number: 250527
Charity reporting is up to date (51 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEPHEN SLADE Chair 06 April 2013
THE CHARITABLE FUND OF ROUND TABLE NO 88
Overdue by 108 days
SCARBOROUGH SCHOOLS CHRISTIAN WORKER TRUST
Received: On time
Adnan Mouhiddin Trustee 16 May 2023
AWARENESS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Tracy Ann Calcraft Trustee 31 March 2022
None on record
Stephen David Bromham Trustee 23 February 2017
None on record
Mark David Dresser Trustee 01 April 2015
None on record
Hilary Watts Trustee 01 April 2015
None on record